Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gerald Patrick Aloysius O’Hara

Deceased

Apostolic Delegate to Great Britain

Titular Archbishop of Pessinus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1895BornGreen Ridge, PA
3 Apr 192024.9Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
26 Apr 192934.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
26 Apr 192934.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Heliopolis in Phoenicia
20 May 192934.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Heliopolis in Phoenicia
16 Nov 193540.5AppointedBishop of Savannah, Georgia, USA
15 Jan 193640.7InstalledBishop of Savannah, Georgia, USA
21 May 194651.0AppointedOfficial to Romania
5 Jul 195055.2ResignedOfficial to Romania
12 Jul 195055.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Savannah-Atlanta, Georgia, USA
27 Nov 195156.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Ireland
8 Jun 195459.1AppointedApostolic Delegate to Great Britain
17 Oct 195964.5ResignedBishop of Savannah, Georgia, USA
17 Oct 195964.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Pessinus
16 Jul 196368.2DiedApostolic Delegate to Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Gerald Patrick Aloysius O’Hara:
Archbishop Gerald Patrick Aloysius O’Hara (born , died ) Apostolic Delegate of Great Britain

  • a priest for 43.3 years
  • a bishop for 34.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1962
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1964
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • r/ab: CB, 11 Jul 2011
  • r/ab: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1963, Page 641
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 4 Feb 2014