Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Adalbert (Bela) Boros

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Ressiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1908BornPadureni, Romania
30 Oct 193224.1Ordained PriestPriest
Nov 1948³40.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Ressiana
12 Dec 194840.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ressiana
14 Mar 199081.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ressiana
6 Jun 200394.7DiedTitular Archbishop of Ressiana

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Adalbert (Bela) Boros:
Archbishop Adalbert (Bela) Boros (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Ressiana

  • a priest for 70.6 years
  • a bishop for 54.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 135
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013