Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Charles O’Reilly

Deceased

Bishop of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1873Born
4 Jun 189825.2Ordained PriestPriest of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
19 Dec 192754.8AppointedBishop of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA
16 Feb 192854.9Ordained BishopBishop of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA
25 Mar 193865.0DiedBishop of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Charles O’Reilly
Bishop Thomas Charles O’Reilly (born , died ) Bishop of Scranton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCleveland

  • a priest for 39.8 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017