Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Saint Augustine

Dioecesis Sancti Augustini



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Felipe de Jesús Estévez, Bishop
  • Victor Benito Galeone, Bishop Emeritus
  • John Joseph Snyder, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 11 March 1870
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Miami
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Florida
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 28,575 (11,032 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: XIV (FL, GA, NC, SC)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: STA
  • Official Web Site: http://www.dosafl.com/
  • Mailing Address: 11625 Old St. Augustine Rd., Jacksonville, FL 32258
  • Telephone: (904)262-3200
  • Fax: 249-3635

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Florida
9 January 1857ErectedDiocese of Savannah Vicariate Apostolic of Florida (erected)
Diocese of Saint Augustine
11 March 1870ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Florida Diocese of Saint Augustine (erected)
25 May 1958Territory LostDiocese of Saint Augustine Diocese of Miami (erected)
10 February 1962Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Saint Augustine (From Baltimore to Atlanta)
2 March 1968Territory LostDiocese of Miami
Diocese of Saint Augustine
Diocese of Orlando (erected)
2 March 1968Territory LostDiocese of Miami
Diocese of Saint Augustine
Diocese of Saint Petersburg (erected)
1 October 1975Territory LostDiocese of Mobile
Diocese of Saint Augustine
Diocese of Pensacola-Tallahassee (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Saint Augustine
195072,0002,734,1162.6%111781893807368581ap1951
1966195,0572,902,3056.7%150112262744141558104ap1967
197071,7651,471,1804.9%103191225881966ap1971
197657,557951,0006.1%5420747772017741ap1977
198065,4161,065,0006.1%53197290811911745ap1981
199093,8371,348,2127.0%8319102919112012350ap1991
1999131,4781,570,1818.4%91271181,11426310850ap2000
2000134,8461,582,6668.5%93261191,133253010751ap2001
2001142,8861,598,2478.9%99271261,134273111151ap2002
2002143,4131,674,9108.6%99251241,156282811251ap2003
2003158,7921,717,5309.2%101271281,240323011851ap2004
2004160,4791,749,1069.2%104251291,244322811551ap2005
2010171,0001,966,3148.7%120161361,257621810051ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 1 Jul 2013