Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maurice Patrick Foley

Deceased

Bishop of Jaro, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1867Born
25 Jul 189124.3Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA
10 Sep 191043.4AppointedBishop of Tuguegarao, Philippines
15 Dec 191043.7Ordained BishopBishop of Tuguegarao, Philippines
6 Sep 191649.4AppointedBishop of Jaro, Philippines
3 Aug 191952.3DiedBishop of Jaro, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Maurice Patrick Foley
Bishop Maurice Patrick Foley (born , died ) Bishop of Jaro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBoston, MA

  • a priest for 28.0 years
  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,910, Number 79

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast