Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Little Rock

Dioecesis Petriculana



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Anthony Basil Taylor, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 28 November 1843
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Oklahoma City
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Arkansas
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 137,600 (53,104 Square Miles)
  • Description: Comprises the State of Arkansas.
  • Conference Region: X (AR, OK, TX)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: LR
  • Official Web Site: http://www.dolr.org/
  • Mailing Address: Chancery Office, 2500 North Tyler St., Little Rock, AR 72207
  • Telephone: (501)664-0340
  • Fax: 664-6304

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
28 November 1843ErectedDiocese of Saint Louis Diocese of Little Rock (erected)
19 July 1850Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Little Rock (to New Orleans)
14 May 1876Territory LostDiocese of Little Rock Prefecture Apostolic of Indian Territory (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
195036,9431,899,3871.9%1085316122911560895ap1951
196650,9831,933,0002.6%1376219925610474385ap1967
197055,2961116017132312060079ap1971*
197655,9912,006,0192.8%10764171327110747680ap1977
198056,9112,205,0002.6%11466180316212053484ap1981
199062,0322,384,0602.6%110521623824795383130ap1991
199989,0912,522,8133.5%8365148601774131490ap2000
200090,6122,538,3033.6%10060160566769832790ap2001
200193,4802,551,3733.7%9961160584769329890ap2002
2002100,8202,673,4003.8%9861159634789128990ap2003
2003103,0912,692,0903.8%9754151682929026888ap2004
2004106,0512,710,0793.9%9454148716908825388ap2005
2011131,9762,889,4504.6%10039139949866417889ap2012

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 2 Apr 2014