Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Ignatius Malone

Bishop of Shreveport, Louisiana, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1950 Born
21 May 197726.7Ordained PriestPriest of Little Rock, Arkansas, USA
19 Nov 201969.2AppointedBishop of Shreveport, Louisiana, USA
28 Jan 202069.4Ordained BishopBishop of Shreveport, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Francis Ignatius Malone
Bishop Francis Ignatius Malone (born ) Bishop of Shreveport

EventPlace
Birth PlacePhiladelphia, Archdiocese of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania
Ordained BishopConvention Center, Shreveport, Diocese of Shreveport, Louisiana

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Shreveport.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Nov 2019
  • mn/ob: CB, 19 Nov 2019
  • loc: CB, 12 Dec 2019
  • c2+: CB, 16 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 28 Jan 2020

Quantcast