Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francis Bible Schulte

Archbishop Emeritus of New Orleans, Louisiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1926 BornPhiladelphia
10 May 195225.4Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
27 Jun 198154.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
27 Jun 198154.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Afufenia
12 Aug 198154.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Afufenia
4 Jun 198558.4AppointedBishop of Wheeling-Charleston, West Virginia, USA
6 Dec 198862.0AppointedArchbishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
14 Feb 198962.1InstalledArchbishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
3 Jan 200275.0RetiredArchbishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Francis Bible Schulte:
Archbishop Francis Bible Schulte (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of New Orleans

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of New Orleans.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 23 Sep 2013