Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sam Joseph Galip Jacobs

Bishop Emeritus of Houma-Thibodaux, Louisiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1938 BornGreenwood
6 Jun 196426.3Ordained PriestPriest of Lafayette, Louisiana, USA
29 Jan 198041.9IncardinatedPriest of Lake Charles, Louisiana, USA
1 Jul 198951.3AppointedBishop of Alexandria, Louisiana, USA
24 Aug 198951.5Ordained BishopBishop of Alexandria, Louisiana, USA
1 Aug 200365.4AppointedBishop of Houma-Thibodaux, Louisiana, USA
10 Oct 200365.6InstalledBishop of Houma-Thibodaux, Louisiana, USA
23 Sep 201375.6RetiredBishop of Houma-Thibodaux, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Sam Joseph Galip Jacobs:
Bishop Sam Joseph Galip Jacobs (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Houma-Thibodaux

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Houma-Thibodaux.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,464
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118
  • r: Bollettino, 23 Sep 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 23 Sep 2013