Catholic-Hierarchy DC

John Joseph Cardinal Krol

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Mercede e Sant’Adriano a Villa Albani


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1910BornCleveland, OH
20 Feb 193726.3Ordained PriestPriest of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
11 Jul 195342.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
11 Jul 195342.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Cadi
2 Sep 195342.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cadi
11 Feb 196150.2AppointedArchbishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
22 Mar 196150.4InstalledArchbishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
26 Jun 196756.6Elevated to Cardinal
26 Jun 196756.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Mercede e Sant’Adriano a Villa Albani
11 Feb 198877.2ResignedArchbishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
3 Mar 199685.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Krol:
John Joseph Cardinal Krol (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Philadelphia

  • a priest for 59.0 years
  • a bishop for 42.5 years
  • a cardinal for 28.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015