Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Floyd Lawrence Begin

Deceased

Bishop of Oakland, California


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1902BornCleveland, OH
31 Jul 192725.5Ordained PriestPriest of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
22 Mar 194745.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
22 Mar 194745.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Sala
1 May 194745.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sala
27 Jan 196260.0AppointedBishop of Oakland, California, USA
28 Apr 196260.2InstalledBishop of Oakland, California, USA
26 Apr 197775.2DiedBishop of Oakland, California, USA

MicroData Summary for Floyd Lawrence Begin:
Bishop Floyd Lawrence Begin (born , died ) Bishop of Oakland

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013