Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Boston

Archidioecesis Bostoniensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Sean Patrick O’Malley, O.F.M. Cap., Cardinal, Archbishop
  • John Anthony Dooher, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Walter James Edyvean, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Robert Francis Hennessey, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Arthur Leo Kennedy, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Peter John Uglietto, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Emilio Simeon Alluč, S.D.B., Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus
  • John Patrick Boles, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus
  • Francis Xavier Irwin, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Boston
8 April 1808ErectedDiocese of Baltimore Diocese of Boston (erected) (Massachusets, Maine, New Hampshire, Rhode Island, Connecticut, and Vermont)
28 November 1843Territory LostDiocese of Boston Diocese of Hartford (erected)
29 July 1853Territory LostDiocese of Boston Diocese of Burlington (erected)
29 July 1853Territory LostDiocese of Boston Diocese of Portland (erected)
14 June 1870Territory LostDiocese of Boston Diocese of Springfield (erected)
16 February 1872Territory LostDiocese of Boston
Diocese of Hartford
Diocese of Providence (erected)
Archdiocese of Boston
12 February 1875ElevatedDiocese of Boston Archdiocese of Boston

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Boston
Archdiocese of Boston
1907850,0004881105981,4211401,567194ce
19501,302,9852,954,30144.1%9918781,8696978784,659364ap1951
19591,582,5773,035,16852.1%1,2879842,2716961,7315,543391ap1960
19661,815,1133,335,89554.4%1,4291,0752,5047241,9716,080411ap1967
19701,2001,0582,25801,2695,715401ap1971*
19762,018,0344,313,39446.8%1,3769842,3608551,2925,664469ap1977
19802,017,1335,789,47834.8%1,2419232,164932921,2774,797407ap1981
19901,872,4353,742,60050.0%9869191,9059821711,2314,069402ap1991
19992,042,6883,761,40054.3%9587071,6651,2262121102,646382ap2000
20002,017,4513,754,20053.7%8306781,5081,3372158662,812373ap2001
20012,038,0323,857,75152.8%8278421,6691,2211841,0022,877369ap2002
20022,069,2253,888,94453.2%8648141,6781,2332091,0322,727362ap2003
20032,083,8993,951,37752.7%8677151,5821,3172469292,841360ap2004
20042,077,4873,970,02652.3%8566701,5261,3612388642,601357ap2005
20061,845,7583,974,84646.4%8225871,4091,3092348032,265303ap2007
20121,921,0004,209,00045.6%7215051,2261,5662656931,760289ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 22 Mar 2014