Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Sean Patrick Cardinal O’Malley, O.F.M. Cap.

Archbishop of Boston, Massachusetts

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Vittoria

Member of the Council of Cardinals

Member of the Pontifical Commission for the Protection of Minors


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1944 BornLakewood, OH, USA
29 Aug 197026.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
30 May 198439.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Saint Thomas, American Virgin Islands, USA
2 Aug 198440.1Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Saint Thomas, American Virgin Islands, USA
16 Oct 198541.3SucceededBishop of Saint Thomas, American Virgin Islands, USA
16 Jun 199248.0AppointedBishop of Fall River, Massachusetts, USA
11 Aug 199248.1InstalledBishop of Fall River, Massachusetts, USA
3 Sep 200258.2AppointedBishop of Palm Beach, Florida, USA
19 Oct 200258.3InstalledBishop of Palm Beach, Florida, USA
1 Jul 200359.0AppointedArchbishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
30 Jul 200359.1InstalledArchbishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
24 Mar 200661.7Elevated to Cardinal
24 Mar 200661.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Vittoria
1 Oct 200662.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Vittoria
13 Apr 201368.8AppointedMember of the Council of Cardinals
22 Mar 201469.7AppointedMember of the Pontifical Commission for the Protection of Minors

MicroData Summary for Sean Patrick O’Malley:
Sean Patrick Cardinal O’Malley O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Archbishop of Boston

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Boston.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Apr 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Mar 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 3 Jul 2014