Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George William Coleman

Bishop Emeritus of Fall River, Massachusetts


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1939 BornFall River
16 Dec 196425.9Ordained PriestPriest of Fall River, Massachusetts, USA
30 Apr 200364.2AppointedBishop of Fall River, Massachusetts, USA
22 Jul 200364.5Ordained BishopBishop of Fall River, Massachusetts, USA
3 Jul 201475.4RetiredBishop of Fall River, Massachusetts, USA

MicroData Summary for George William Coleman:
Bishop George William Coleman (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Fall River

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Fall River.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,428
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 3 Jul 2014