Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Hartford

Archidioecesis Hartfortiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Leonard Paul Blair, Archbishop
  • Juan Miguel Betancourt Torres, S.E.M.V., Auxiliary Bishop-Elect
  • Daniel Anthony Cronin, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Henry Joseph Mansell, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Christie Albert Macaluso, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus
  • Peter Anthony Rosazza, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Hartford
28 November 1843ErectedDiocese of Boston Diocese of Hartford (erected) (Connecticut and Rhode Island)
16 February 1872Territory LostDiocese of Hartford Diocese of Providence (erected)
12 February 1875Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Burlington (from New York to Boston)
Diocese of Hartford (from New York to Boston)
Diocese of Portland (from New York to Boston)
Diocese of Providence (from New York to Boston)
Diocese of Springfield in Massachusetts (from New York to Boston)
6 August 1953Territory LostDiocese of Hartford Diocese of Bridgeport (erected)
Diocese of Norwich (erected)
Archdiocese of Hartford
6 August 1953ElevatedDiocese of Hartford Archdiocese of Hartford

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Hartford
1843330ce
1909375,0003501,0711,250173ce
1950670,0001,709,24239.2%7181578757652962,319280ap1951
Archdiocese of Hartford
1966766,8381,632,60047.0%5741787521,0194622,048203ap1966
1970833,7461,698,40049.1%5871737601,0972581,950208ap1971
1976829,8361,739,97047.7%5381216591,259312831,061221ap1977
1980796,0001,762,00045.2%5221216431,237137268791223ap1981
1990811,7821,804,00045.0%493765691,426267230954225ap1991
1999757,7931,806,70541.9%4111335441,393544401,001220ap2000
2000742,9581,802,98141.2%3901365261,412294321967219ap2001
2001745,0691,805,27841.3%3831365191,435308292937218ap2002
2002719,9631,863,38438.6%3651344991,442308290901218ap2003
2003698,6551,873,98337.3%3691335021,391308287883216ap2004
2004694,2201,873,98637.0%3351214561,522300266833215ap2005
2006686,2311,910,54235.9%3441114551,508287232827213ap2007
2013723,0002,011,00036.0%311944051,785307211628213ap2014
2016738,0002,054,00035.9%2981124101,800209219579212ap2017

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_d, v3.2.4, 16 Sep 2018; Data: 19 Sep 2018

Quantcast