Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Aloysius McGurkin, M.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Shinyanga, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1905Born
14 Sep 193025.2Ordained PriestPriest of Catholic Foreign Mission Society of America
4 Jul 195651.0AppointedBishop of Shinyanga, Tanzania
3 Oct 195651.2Ordained BishopBishop of Shinyanga, Tanzania
30 Jan 197569.6ResignedBishop of Shinyanga, Tanzania
28 Aug 198378.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Shinyanga, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Edward Aloysius McGurkin
Bishop Edward Aloysius McGurkin M.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Shinyanga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHartford, CT, USA

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 86

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018