Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John James Rudin, M.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Musoma, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1916Born
11 Jun 194427.5Ordained PriestPriest of Catholic Foreign Mission Society of America
5 Jul 195740.6AppointedBishop of Musoma, Tanzania
3 Oct 195740.8Ordained BishopBishop of Musoma, Tanzania
12 Jan 197962.1ResignedBishop of Musoma, Tanzania
14 Jun 199578.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Musoma, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for John James Rudin
Bishop John James Rudin M.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Musoma

EventPlace
Birth PlacePittsfield, MA, USA

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 37.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018