Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Wolfgang von Bodman

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

Titular Bishop of Dardanus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1651³Born
5 Feb 167322.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
6 Aug 167322.5Ordained PriestPriest of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
2 Sep 168635.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
2 Sep 168635.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Dardanus
26 Nov 168635.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dardanus
29 Sep 169140.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johannes Wolfgang von Bodman
Bishop Johannes Wolfgang von Bodman (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBodman

  • a priest for 18.1 years
  • a bishop for 4.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 182
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1686, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018