Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cornelius Ludovicus van Wijckerslooth van Schalkwijk (Wykerslooth)

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Curium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1786BornHaarlem, Netherlands
25 Jun 181125.1Ordained PriestPriest
7 Feb 183245.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Curium
15 Sep 183347.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Curium
10 Nov 185165.5DiedTitular Bishop of Curium

MicroData Summary for Cornelius Ludovicus van Wijckerslooth van Schalkwijk (Wykerslooth):
Bishop Cornelius Ludovicus van Wijckerslooth van Schalkwijk (Wykerslooth) (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Curium

  • a priest for 40.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 170

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 13 Nov 2014