Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Klemens August Droste zu Vischering

Deceased

Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1773BornVorheim
14 May 179825.3Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
9 Apr 182754.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
9 Apr 182754.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Calama
28 Oct 182754.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Calama
1 Dec 183562.8SelectedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
1 Feb 183663.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
29 May 183663.3InstalledArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
19 Oct 184572.7DiedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Klemens August Droste zu Vischering (VIAF: 7382261)
Archbishop Klemens August Droste zu Vischering (born , died ) Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 125, and Page 156
  • c34: ATh, 29 Oct 2015
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,635
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1827, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 Aug 2016