Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Arnold Melchers

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Münster

Titular Bishop of Hebron


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1765³BornWerne
8 Apr 178923.5Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
21 Nov 183671.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
21 Nov 183671.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Hebron
6 May 183771.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hebron
18 Feb 185185.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franz Arnold Melchers:
Bishop Franz Arnold Melchers (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Münster

  • a priest for 61.9 years
  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 211

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013