Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Kornelius Dammers

Deceased

Bishop of Paderborn


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1762BornPaderborn
27 Jul 178624.4Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
3 May 182462.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
3 May 182462.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiberias
24 Aug 182462.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tiberias
27 Nov 184179.8SelectedBishop of Paderborn, Germany
23 May 184280.2ConfirmedBishop of Paderborn, Germany
23 Aug 184280.5InstalledBishop of Paderborn, Germany
11 Oct 184482.6DiedBishop of Paderborn, Germany

MicroData Summary for Richard Kornelius Dammers:
Bishop Richard Kornelius Dammers (born , died ) Bishop of Paderborn

  • a priest for 58.2 years
  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 296, and Page 369

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013