Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kaspar Max Droste zu Vischering

Deceased

Bishop of Münster


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1770BornVorheim
13 Jul 179323.0Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
1 Jun 179524.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
1 Jun 179524.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Ierichus
6 Sep 179525.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ierichus
15 Jun 182554.9SelectedBishop of Münster, Germany
17 Dec 182555.4ConfirmedBishop of Münster, Germany
4 Apr 182655.7InstalledBishop of Münster, Germany
3 Aug 184676.0DiedBishop of Münster, Germany

MicroData Summary for Kaspar Max Droste zu Vischering
Bishop Kaspar Max Droste zu Vischering (born , died ) Bishop of Münster

  • a priest for 53.0 years
  • a bishop for 50.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 269
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1795, Number 19
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 242, and Page 453

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Jun 2016