Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Klemens Wenzeslaus von Sachsen

Deceased

Bishop of Augsburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1739³BornHubertusburg
18 Apr 176323.5SelectedBishop of Freising, Germany
27 Apr 176323.5SelectedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
4 May 176323.6ConfirmedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
22 Aug 176323.9ConfirmedBishop of Freising, Germany
11 Mar 176424.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
29 Apr 176424.5Ordained PriestPriest
5 Nov 176425.1SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Augsburg, Germany
27 Mar 176525.4ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Augsburg, Germany
10 Aug 176626.8Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Augsburg, Germany
10 Feb 176828.3SelectedArchbishop of Trier, Germany
14 Mar 176828.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Trier, Germany
20 Aug 176828.8ResignedBishop of Freising, Germany
20 Aug 176828.8ResignedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
20 Aug 176828.8SucceededBishop of Augsburg, Germany
29 Nov 180162.1ResignedArchbishop of Trier, Germany
27 Jul 181272.8DiedBishop of Augsburg, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Klemens Wenzeslaus von Sachsen:
Archbishop Klemens Wenzeslaus von Sachsen (born , died ) Bishop of Augsburg

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 45.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,485
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1766, Number 24
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 106, and Page 219
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 352, and Page 414

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 16 Jan 2016