Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Anton von Wolframsdorf

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Regensburg

Titular Bishop of Arethusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1713BornEgmating
17 Jul 173522.5Ordained PriestPriest of Regensburg, Germany
3 Mar 176047.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany
3 Mar 176047.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Arethusa
Apr 1760²47.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arethusa
15 Sep 176653.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Anton von Wolframsdorf:
Bishop Johann Anton von Wolframsdorf (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Regensburg

  • a priest for 31.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,483

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013