Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Karl Joseph von Hohenlohe-Waldenburg-Schillingsfürst

Deceased

Bishop of Augsburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1745BornWaldenburg
7 Apr 178741.4Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
9 Aug 180256.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany
9 Aug 180256.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tempe
5 Sep 180256.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tempe
5 Feb 181872.2SelectedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
6 Apr 181872.4ConfirmedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
9 Oct 181973.9DiedBishop of Augsburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz Karl Joseph von Hohenlohe-Waldenburg-Schillingsfürst:
Bishop Franz Karl Joseph von Hohenlohe-Waldenburg-Schillingsfürst (born , died ) Bishop of Augsburg

  • a priest for 32.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 95, and Page 361

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013