Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Jakob von Mayer

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany

Titular Bishop of Pergamum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1677Born
19 Dec 169922.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Augsburg, Germany
18 Dec 170023.0Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
5 Dec 171840.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany
5 Dec 171840.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Pergamum
8 Jan 171941.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pergamum
7 Dec 174971.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Jakob von Mayer
Bishop Johann Jakob von Mayer (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Augsburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDillingen

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 310
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1719, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018