Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Karl Joseph von Fugger-Glött

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

Titular Bishop of Domitiopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1708Born
5 Aug 173123.0Ordained PriestPriest of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
20 Jul 173931.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
20 Jul 173931.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Domitiopolis
30 Aug 173931.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Domitiopolis
3 Apr 176859.7ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
10 Oct 176961.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz Karl Joseph von Fugger-Glött
Bishop Franz Karl Joseph von Fugger-Glött (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Konstanz {Constance}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceInnsbruck

  • a priest for 38.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2: CB, 11 Dec 2012
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 29
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 199, and Page 452
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018