Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Ignaz von Fugger-Glött

Deceased

Bishop of Regensburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1711BornInnsbruck
26 Sep 173422.8Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
18 Jan 176957.2SelectedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
12 Jun 176957.6ConfirmedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
17 Sep 176957.8Ordained BishopBishop of Regensburg, Germany
15 Feb 178775.2DiedBishop of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Anton Ignaz von Fugger-Glött:
Bishop Anton Ignaz von Fugger-Glött (born , died ) Bishop of Regensburg

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015