Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Franz Konrad Kasimir Ignaz Cardinal von Rodt

Deceased

Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1706BornMeersburg
14 Apr 173731.0Ordained PriestPriest of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
9 Nov 175044.6SelectedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
15 Mar 175145.0ConfirmedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
22 Jul 175650.3Elevated to Cardinal
2 Aug 175852.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo
16 Oct 177569.5DiedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz Konrad Kasimir Ignaz von Rodt:
Franz Konrad Kasimir Ignaz Cardinal von Rodt (born , died ) Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}

  • a priest for 38.5 years
  • a cardinal for 19.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Jul 1756

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015