Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Adam Nieberlein

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Eichstätt, Germany

Titular Bishop of Dioclea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1662³Born
17 Mar 168624.0Ordained PriestPriest of Eichstätt, Germany
12 Mar 170846.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Eichstätt, Germany
12 Mar 170846.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Dioclea
29 Apr 170846.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dioclea
15 Sep 174482.5ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Eichstätt, Germany
28 Dec 174886.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Eichstätt, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Adam Nieberlein
Bishop Johann Adam Nieberlein (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Eichstätt

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEichstätt, Diocese of Eichstätt
Ordained BishopSankt Walburga, Church, Eichstätt, Diocese of Eichstätt

  • a priest for 62.7 years
  • a bishop for 40.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 185
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1708, Number 4
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,608
  • b/c2+: ATh
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 61, Number 4,639

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast