Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Christoph von Freyberg-Allmendingen

Deceased

Bishop of Augsburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1616Born
5 Apr 164225.5Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
18 Aug 166548.8SelectedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
11 Oct 166650.0ConfirmedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
17 Apr 166750.5Ordained BishopBishop of Augsburg, Germany
1 Apr 169073.5DiedBishop of Augsburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Christoph von Freyberg-Allmendingen
Bishop Johann Christoph von Freyberg-Allmendingen (born , died ) Bishop of Augsburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAltheim
Ordained BishopCathedral, Augsburg, Diocese of Augsburg

  • a priest for 47.9 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 101
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1667, Number 9
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 52, Number 3,583
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 74, Number 5,883

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast