Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georg Sigismund Müller

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}

Titular Bishop of Heliopolis in Augustamnica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1615BornRottenburg
1 Nov 165439.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
1 Nov 165439.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Heliopolis in Augustamnica
11 Jul 165540.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Heliopolis in Augustamnica
24 Mar 168670.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Georg Sigismund Müller:
Bishop Georg Sigismund Müller (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}

  • a bishop for 30.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,945
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1655, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 7 Apr 2015