Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastian Denich

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Regensburg, Germany

Titular Bishop of Halmiros


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1596Born
162124.4Ordained PriestPriest of Regensburg, Germany
3 Oct 165054.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany
3 Oct 165054.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Halmiros
26 Mar 165154.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Halmiros
2 Jun 1661³64.8ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany
6 Dec 167175.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Regensburg, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sebastian Denich (VIAF: 55013310)
Bishop Sebastian Denich (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Regensburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIngolstadt

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 80
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1651, Number 10
  • ln/r: CB, 16 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jan 2017