Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marquard von Schenk von Castell

Deceased

Bishop of Eichstätt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1605BornUberdann
6 Jun 163529.8Ordained PriestPriest of Eichstätt, Germany
28 Jul 163731.9SelectedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
16 Nov 163732.2ConfirmedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
10 Jan 163832.4Ordained BishopBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
18 Jan 168579.4DiedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany

MicroData Summary for Marquard von Schenk von Castell:
Bishop Marquard von Schenk von Castell (born , died ) Bishop of Eichstätt

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 47.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 184
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1638, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 26 Mar 2015