Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich von Knöringen

Deceased

Bishop of Augsburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1570Born
14 Sep 159525.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
29 Nov 159828.8SelectedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
19 Apr 159929.2ConfirmedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
May 159929.2Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jun 159929.3Ordained BishopBishop of Augsburg, Germany
25 Jun 164676.3DiedBishop of Augsburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Heinrich von Knöringen (VIAF: 10203854)
Bishop Heinrich von Knöringen (born , died ) Bishop of Augsburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNesselwang
Ordained BishopHoly Cross, Cathedral, Augsburg, Diocese of Augsburg

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 47.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 101
  • ob/c2+: CB, 31 Oct 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1599, Number 11
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 22, Number 1,245
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 50, Number 3,415

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 22 Jun 2020

Quantcast