Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Christoph von Westerstetten

Deceased

Bishop of Eichstätt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1563BornWasseralfingen
11 Aug 158926.6Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
4 Dec 161249.9SelectedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
28 Jan 161350.1ConfirmedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
14 Apr 161350.3Ordained BishopBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
28 Jul 163774.6DiedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Christoph von Westerstetten:
Bishop Johann Christoph von Westerstetten (born , died ) Bishop of Eichstätt

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,002
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 184

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013