Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Iñigo Cardinal Avalos de Aragón, O.S. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1535BornNaples
26 Feb 156126.2Elevated to Cardinal
3 Jun 156126.4InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Lucia in Septisolio
3 Jan 156328.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Torino {Turin}, Italy
30 Jul 156328.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro
May 1564³29.3ResignedApostolic Administrator of Torino {Turin}, Italy
19 Jan 156530.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Adriano al Foro
19 Aug 156631.6AppointedBishop of Mileto, Italy
13 Oct 156631.8Ordained BishopBishop of Mileto, Italy
3 Mar 156732.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
9 Feb 157338.1ResignedBishop of Mileto, Italy
13 Oct 158651.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
2 Mar 158954.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
20 Mar 159156.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
20 Feb 160065.1DiedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Iñigo Avalos de Aragón:
Cardinal Iñigo Avalos de Aragón O.S. (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

  • a bishop for 33.4 years
  • a cardinal for 39.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Feb 1561
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 309, and Page 244
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 10, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013