Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giacomo Cardinal Savelli

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1523¹BornRome
19 Dec 153917.0Elevated to Cardinal
16 Apr 154017.3InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Lucia in Orphea
5 Nov 154017.8AppointedAdministrator of Nicastro, Italy
8 Jan 154320.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano
13 Apr 154522.3AppointedAdministrator of Teramo, Italy
26 May 154623.4ResignedAdministrator of Teramo, Italy
9 Mar 155229.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
19 Nov 155431.9ResignedAdministrator of Nicastro, Italy
29 May 155532.4AppointedAdministrator of Gubbio, Italy
6 Feb 155633.1ResignedAdministrator of Gubbio, Italy
6 Feb 155633.1AppointedAdministrator of Nicastro, Italy
16 Dec 155836.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
19 Jan 156037.0AppointedCardinal-Priest
25 Jan 156037.1Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jan 156037.1ResignedAdministrator of Nicastro, Italy
26 Nov 156037.9AppointedAdministrator of Benevento, Italy
8 Apr 157350.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
17 May 157451.4ResignedAdministrator of Benevento, Italy
31 Jul 157754.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
9 Jul 157855.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
9 Mar 158360.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
5 Dec 158764.9DiedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Savelli:
Cardinal Giacomo Savelli (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

  • a priest for 27.9 years
  • a cardinal for 48.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Dec 1539
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 112, and Page 256
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 132
  • bd/op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013