Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giulio Cardinal della Rovere

Deceased

Archbishop of Ravenna

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1533BornUrbino
27 Jul 154714.3Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
9 Jan 154814.8Elevated to Cardinal
9 Apr 154815.0InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Pietro in Vincoli
24 Sep 154815.5AppointedBishop of Urbino, Italy
18 Nov 155118.6AppointedAdministrator of Novara, Italy
12 Sep 155219.4ResignedAdministrator of Novara, Italy
13 Sep 156027.4AppointedBishop of Vicenza, Italy
13 Apr 156532.0ResignedBishop of Vicenza, Italy
15 Feb 156632.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
6 Mar 156632.9AppointedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
15 Apr 156633.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
12 Apr 157037.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
3 Jul 157037.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
8 Apr 157340.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
3 Sep 157845.4DiedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giulio della Rovere:
Cardinal Giulio della Rovere (born , died ) Archbishop of Ravenna

  • a bishop for 12.4 years
  • a cardinal for 31.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 27 Jul 1547
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 260, and Page 323
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 333, and Page 283
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 30
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 9, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013