Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Vicenza

Dioecesis Vicentina



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Giuliano Brugnotto, Bishop
  • Beniamino Pizziol, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 2nd Century
  • Metropolitan: Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
  • Depends on: Dicastery for Bishops
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Italy
  • Square Kilometers: 2,200 (849 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Triveneto
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesi.vicenza.it/
  • Mailing Address: Vescovado, Piazza Duomo 10, 36100 Vicenza, Italia
  • Telephone: 0444.22.63.00
  • Fax: 0444.32.65.30

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
2nd CenturyErectedDiocese of Vicenza (erected)
6 July 1751Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Vicenza (from Aquileia to Udine)
28 January 1927Territory AddedDiocese of Padova {Padua} (Malo) Diocese of Vicenza
18 March 1927Territory AddedDiocese of Padova {Padua} (Right bank of the river Brenta near Piazzala sul Brenta) Diocese of Vicenza
20 August 1930Territory LostDiocese of Vicenza (Bubbio, Burcia, and the area between BosÓ and Cittadella) Diocese of Padova {Padua}
20 August 1930Territory AddedDiocese of Padova {Padua} (Saline, Vicentina, and Brancaglia) Diocese of Vicenza
6 July 1964Territory AddedArchdiocese of Trento (Val d'Astico and Pedemonte) Diocese of Vicenza
8 August 2014Territory AddedDiocese of Verona (Caselle di Pressana in Pressana (VR)) Diocese of Vicenza

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1886349,550.0%7900213OTC
1950602,600602,788100.0%7051948996703252,238307ap1951
1969617,670617,99399.9%73123096164273812,747345ap1971
1980701,723703,12999.8%725246971722103992,852349ap1981
1990737,820739,50199.8%687240927795244092,290354ap1991
1999753,409764,92498.5%613239852884213182,257354ap2000
2000753,474766,11898.3%600242842894213182,289354ap2001
2001754,069768,46498.1%586229815925262862,502354ap2002
2002753,045768,39198.0%594234828909262892,235354ap2003
2003753,150768,92897.9%589209798943332621,809354ap2004
2004753,556769,81797.9%580214794949322952,162354ap2005
2010790,848855,60892.4%5331997321,080382611,825354ap2011
2014787,000853,39492.2%4891946831,152412531,658354ap2015
2017780,143849,07491.9%4651916561,189432401,499355ap2018
2020776,068848,16291.5%4211725931,308462131,300355ap2021
2022768,000839,38091.5%3891525411,419501871,153355ap2023

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 526
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 267
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 333
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 367, and Page 368
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 414
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 441
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 395
  • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 806, to Page 808
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 19, Page 265, and Page 266
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 19, Page 279, and Page 280
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 23, Page 332, and Page 333
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 57, Page 363, and Page 364
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 107, Page 841

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.7, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 25 Apr 2024