Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Pietro Dal Toso

Apostolic Nuncio to Jordan

Titular Archbishop of Foratiana

Apostolic Nuncio to Cyprus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1964 Born
24 Jun 198924.7Ordained PriestPriest of Bolzano-Bressanone {Bozen-Brixen}, Italy
1 Mar 199631.4AppointedOfficial of the Pontifical Council “Cor Unum”
21 Jun 200439.7AppointedOfficial of the Pontifical Council “Cor Unum”
22 Jun 201045.7AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Council “Cor Unum”
1 Jan 201752.2CeasedSecretary of the Pontifical Council “Cor Unum”
9 Nov 201753.0AppointedAdjunct Secretary of the Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples
9 Nov 201753.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Foratiana
16 Dec 201753.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Foratiana
3 Dec 202258.1CeasedAdjunct Secretary of the Dicastery for Evangelization
21 Jan 202358.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Jordan
17 Feb 202358.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Cyprus

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Pietro Dal Toso
(VIAF: 76474685; WikiData: Q4154204)
Archbishop Giovanni Pietro Dal Toso (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Jordan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVicenza, Diocese of Vicenza, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Jordan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Nov 2017
  • ob/c2+: CB, 18 Nov 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Number 19,617
  • c1: CB, 15 Dec 2022
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Jan 2023
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Feb 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 17 Feb 2023