Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelm Emil Egger, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bolzano-Bressanone {Bozen-Brixen}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1940BornInnsbruck
30 Aug 195616.3ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
29 Jun 196525.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
29 Jul 198646.2AppointedBishop of Bolzano-Bressanone {Bozen-Brixen}, Italy
31 Aug 198646.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bolzano-Bressanone {Bozen-Brixen}, Italy
16 Aug 200868.3DiedBishop of Bolzano-Bressanone {Bozen-Brixen}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Wilhelm Emil Egger:
Bishop Wilhelm Emil Egger O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Bolzano-Bressanone {Bozen-Brixen}

  • a priest for 43.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 4 Nov 2013