Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Reinhold Stecher

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Innsbruck


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1921BornInnsbruck
19 Dec 194725.9Ordained PriestPriest of Innsbruck, Austria
15 Dec 198058.9AppointedBishop of Innsbruck, Austria
25 Jan 198159.0Ordained BishopBishop of Innsbruck, Austria
10 Oct 199775.8RetiredBishop of Innsbruck, Austria
29 Jan 201391.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Innsbruck, Austria

MicroData Summary for Reinhold Stecher:
Bishop Reinhold Stecher (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Innsbruck

  • a priest for 65.1 years
  • a bishop for 32.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 30 Jan 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015