Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manfred Scheuer

Bishop of Linz, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1955 Born
10 Oct 198025.1Ordained PriestPriest of Linz, Austria
21 Oct 200348.1AppointedBishop of Innsbruck, Austria
14 Dec 200348.3Ordained BishopBishop of Innsbruck, Austria
18 Nov 201560.2AppointedBishop of Linz, Austria

MicroData Summary for Manfred Scheuer (VIAF: 119466588)
Bishop Manfred Scheuer (born ) Bishop of Linz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHaibach ob der Donau

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Linz.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Number 14,490
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Nov 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Jan 2017