Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hermann Glettler, Comm. l'Emm.

Bishop of Innsbruck, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1965 Born
1987¹21.9ProfessedMember of Emmanuel Community
23 Jun 199126.4Ordained PriestPriest of Graz-Seckau, Austria
27 Sep 201752.7AppointedBishop of Innsbruck, Austria
2 Dec 201752.9Ordained BishopBishop of Innsbruck, Austria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hermann Glettler (VIAF: 81136828)
Bishop Hermann Glettler Comm. l'Emm. (born ) Bishop of Innsbruck

EventPlace
Birth PlaceÜbelbach, Diocese of Graz-Seckau
Ordained BishopOlympiaworld, Innsbruck, Diocese of Innsbruck

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Innsbruck.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Sep 2017
  • qcle/ob/c2+: CB, 27 Sep 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Number 19,610

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast