Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Graz-Seckau

Dioecesis Graecensis-Seccoviensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Wilhelm Krautwaschl, Bishop
  • Egon Kapellari, Bishop Emeritus
  • Johann Weber, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 22 April 1963
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Salzburg
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Austria
  • Square Kilometers: 16,392 (6,331 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.graz-seckau.at/
  • Mailing Address: Bischofliches Ordinariat, Bischofplatz 4, A-8010 Graz, Oesterreich
  • Telephone: (0316)80.410
  • Fax: 80.41.303

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Seckau
22 June 1218ErectedArchdiocese of Salzburg Diocese of Seckau (erected)
1 September 1859Territory AddedDiocese of Leoben (suppressed) Diocese of Seckau
Diocese of Graz-Seckau
22 April 1963Name ChangedDiocese of Seckau Diocese of Graz-Seckau

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Seckau
1950952,4001,080,20088.2%6273069331,0203421,860370ap1951
Diocese of Graz-Seckau
19701,098,3761,223,05889.8%6442749181,1963151,679379ap1971
19801,130,6881,269,44989.1%5212457661,476113451,577392ap1981
19901,073,1631,186,52590.4%4571896461,661302861,002394ap1991
1999949,5621,160,55481.8%3861545401,75838266761389ap2000
2000943,6991,160,95681.3%3761525281,78751254714389ap2001
2001939,1201,202,80078.1%3701535231,79551257689388ap2002
2002933,2361,185,91178.7%3631535161,80850258672388ap2003
2003924,0251,183,30378.1%3541434971,85948237670388ap2004
2004916,0501,183,30377.4%3521555071,80648243657388ap2005
2006903,9631,154,01378.3%3461524981,81555261592388ap2007
2013863,2861,213,25571.2%3161384541,90171230489388ap2014

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_d, v3.1.6, 5 May 2016; Data: 21 Aug 2016