Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christophe von Zach

Deceased

Bishop of Seckau, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1474¹Born
29 Jul 150228.5AppointedBishop of Seckau, Austria
31 Dec 150228.9Ordained BishopBishop of Seckau, Austria
27 Sep 150834.7DiedBishop of Seckau, Austria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Christophe von Zach (VIAF: 316388723)
Bishop Christophe von Zach (born 1474, died ) Bishop of Seckau

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSanta Maria del Anima, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 5.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 233
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,502, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast