Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jakob Cardinal Missia

Deceased

Archbishop of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1838Born
30 May 186324.9Ordained PriestPriest of Seckau, Austria
14 Jun 188445.9SelectedBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
10 Nov 188446.3ConfirmedBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
7 Dec 188446.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
24 Mar 189859.7AppointedArchbishop of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy
19 Jun 189960.9Elevated to Cardinal
14 Dec 189961.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
23 Mar 190263.7DiedArchbishop of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Jakob Missia (VIAF: 54949860)
Jakob Cardinal Missia (born , died ) Archbishop of Gorizia e Gradisca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMota, Diocese of Seckau, Austria
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopGraz
Death PlaceSt. Cross Ljutomeru, Mota, Archdiocese of Gorizia e Gradisca
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Gorizia, Archdiocese of Gorizia e Gradisca

  • a priest for 38.8 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
  • a cardinal for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 289, and Page 330
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 53
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Jun 1899
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1884, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 Apr 2017