Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Johann Evangelist Cardinal Haller

Deceased

Archbishop of Salzburg

Cardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1825BornSankt Martin in Passeier
4 Jul 184722.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Trento, Italy
21 May 184823.1Ordained PriestPriest of Trento, Italy
14 Aug 187449.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trento, Italy
14 Aug 187449.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Adraa
4 Oct 187449.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adraa
20 Dec 188055.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Salzburg, Austria
20 May 189065.1SelectedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
26 Jun 189065.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
10 Aug 189065.3InstalledArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
29 Nov 189570.6Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jun 189671.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola
5 May 190075.0DiedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Johann Evangelist Haller:
Cardinal Johann Evangelist Haller (born , died ) Archbishop of Salzburg

  • a priest for 52.0 years
  • a bishop for 25.6 years
  • a cardinal for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 76, and Page 493
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 47
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 29 Nov 1895

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013